MA H3399 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Adopted 120 YEAS to 35 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Adopted 120 YEAS to 35 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 34)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Filed by Mr. Mark of Peru. April 15, 2015.
Title
Special procedures for consideration of the House Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2016 for the maintenance of departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (House, No. 3400) ought to be adopted
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Mark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Adopted 120 YEAS to 35 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 34) |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment 5 rejected 35 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 33) |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment 4 rejected 35 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 32) |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment 3 rejected 35 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 31) |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment 2 rejected 35 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 30) |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment 1 rejected 35 YEAS to 120 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 29) |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee recommended ought to be adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H227 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H907 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1010 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1011 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
H1482 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4748 (Similar To) 2016-12-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3399 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3399.pdf |