MA H3383 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-30 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative McMurtry of Dedham, a petition of Paul McMurtry that the bridge on Ames Street over the Charles River in the town of Dedham be designated as the Honorable Kelly A. Timilty memorial bridge. Transportation.
Title
Designating a certain bridge in the town of Dedham as the Honorable Kelly A. Timilty memorial bridge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2023-10-26 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2023-10-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2023-10-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2023-09-25 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-25 | House | Accompanied by S2292 |
2023-08-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 08/29/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3383 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3383.pdf |