MA H3381 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4967
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4967
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to establishing a disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Establishing the Representative Chris Walsh disaster and emergency aid fund for Massachusetts artists
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Keefe [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] | Rep. James O'Day [D] | Sen. James Eldridge [D] |
Rep. Brian Murray [D] | Rep. Michelle DuBois [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] |
Rep. Jack Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-15 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4967 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1487 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
H2896 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2247 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4967 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2896 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S2247 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4967 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3381 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3381.pdf |