MA S2247 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to foster artist businesses in Cultural Districts. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
To foster artist businesses in cultural districts
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Lesser [D] | Rep. Mary Keefe [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-10-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S99 (Similar To) 2022-01-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2624
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1487 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H232 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1487 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4844
S103 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2912
S88 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied a study order, see S3050
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
H2897 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2247 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2247.pdf |