MA H3379 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4555
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-11)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4555
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the creation of a women's rights history trail. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the creation of a women's rights history trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | New draft substituted, see H4555 |
2022-03-17 | House | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2022-03-17 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4555 |
2022-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-03-10 | House | Accompanied by S2249 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
S2249 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Accompanied H3379
H4555 (Replaced by) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
H4555 (Replaced by) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3379 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3379.pdf |