MA S2249 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied H3379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-10 - Accompanied H3379
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the creation of a women's rights history trail. Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development.
Title
Relative to the creation of a women's rights history trail
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Accompanied H3379 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/07/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Tourism, Arts and Cultural Development |
Same As/Similar To
H3379 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - New draft substituted, see H4555
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2079 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
S1307 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H4555 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H101 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5218
S878 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H4003 (Similar To) 2021-08-03 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2021
H4018 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 75 of the Acts of 2021
H4056 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - See H4018
S1280 (Similar To) 2022-07-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2397 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S87 (Similar To) 2022-06-30 - New draft substituted, see S2954
S2079 (Similar To) 2022-06-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2931
S1307 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5225
H4555 (Similar To) 2022-05-26 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 76 of the Acts of 2022
H5363 (Similar To) 2022-11-03 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2249 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2249.pdf |