MA H3361 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate the distribution of transportation funds. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To modernize and enhance the distribution of Chapter 90 funds

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28SenateSenate concurred
2024-02-12HouseReporting date extended to Thursday May 23, 2024, pending concurrence
2023-11-08JointHearing scheduled for 11/20/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2023-03-13SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2220 (Similar To) 2024-05-21 - Accompanied a study order, see S2794

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback