MA H3358 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the reporting requirements of persons engaged in the towing away of motor vehicles. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to reduce administrative burden for government and industry
Sponsors
Rep. James O'Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-24 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
S2175 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2715
S2284 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2637 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2284 (Similar To) 2022-02-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2637
H441 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2637 (Similar To) 2022-02-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3358 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3358.pdf |