MA H333 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2675
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2675
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require real estate licensing education to include a fair housing training component. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to realtor fair housing education
Sponsors
Rep. Tackey Chan [D] | Rep. Patricia Duffy [D] | Sen. Jacob Oliveira [D] | Rep. Tram Nguyen [D] |
Rep. Marcos Devers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2675 |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-07-07 | Joint | Hearing canceled – new hearing TBD |
2021-07-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H3774 (Similar To) 2021-08-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 39 of the Acts of 2021
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1520 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2957
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S881 (Similar To) 2022-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5276
H3938 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S240 (Similar To) 2021-11-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4242
S1520 (Similar To) 2022-06-27 - New draft substituted, see S2957
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
S1614 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1374 (Similar To) 2022-02-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
S868 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5351
S2675 (Replaced by) 2022-07-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4201 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H333 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H333.pdf |