MA H3328 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a sick leave bank for Jacqueline Eld, an employee of the Middlesex Probate and Family Court. The Judiciary.
Title
Establishing a sick leave bank for Jacqueline Eld, an employee of the Middlesex Probate and Family Court
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Donato [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 13 of the Acts of 2013 | |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2013-05-09 | House | Enacted |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-05-06 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendment |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Amended by striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of S1777 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Read second |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Committee recommeded ought to pass with an amendment, inserting in place thereof the text of S1777 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2013-03-21 | House | Read second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2013-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-03-21 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-03-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to the committee on House Rules, reported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3328 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3328.pdf |