MA H329 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to disclosure notice in the right to repair motor vehicle data law. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to disclosure notice in the right to repair motor vehicle data law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday December 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/17/2023 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S142 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
H290 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H360 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
S2478 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H290 (Similar To) 2024-07-08 - Senate concurred
H360 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2478
S2478 (Similar To) 2023-10-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H329 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H329.pdf |