MA H3287 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Day of Stoneham, a petition of Michael S. Day that retailers of home heating oil provide notices to customers of the availability of liability insurance coverage for certain claims arising out of releases of oil into the environment. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Requiring disclosure to consumers regarding home heating oil insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Day [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-07-21 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
2022-07-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-07-21 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-06-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday May 2, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-01-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/11/2022 from 11:30 AM-03:30 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H2487 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5190
H1119 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1537 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H1169 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1119 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1537 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2762
H1169 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3287 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3287.pdf |