MA H1169 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to add a compulsory death benefit to automobile liability insurance. Financial Services.
Title
To add a compulsory death benefit to automobile liability insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-04-11 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2022-04-11 | House | Rules suspended |
2022-04-11 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S3104 (Similar To) 2022-09-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1169 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1169.pdf |