MA H3263 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5212
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H5212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to identification for certain delivery vehicles under the control of the Department of Telecommunications and Energy. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to delivery vehicle identification
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5212 |
2022-01-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/18/2022 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-10-29 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H5212 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3263 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3263.pdf |