MA H325 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4130
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the administration of epi-pens in the public schools. Education.
Title
For safety in our public schools
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Vega [D] | Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D] | Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. James Miceli [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4130 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H4130 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H256 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
H4130 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H325 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H325.pdf |