MA H3242 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4156
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 121-32-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4156
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the labeling of genetically engineered food. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Establishing the genetic engineering transparency food and seed labeling act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4156 |
2015-09-11 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/22/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4156 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1208 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
H2093 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H808 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1947 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3869
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3996 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S1208 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
H2093 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H808 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1947 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3869
S1059 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3996 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3242 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3242.pdf |