MA H1947 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3869
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3869
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Ms. Fox of Boston, a petition of Gloria L. Fox, Chris Walsh and Linda Dorcena Forry that the Department of Public Health be directed to establish a lupus erythematosus registry. Public Health.
Title
To establish a lupus erythematosus study and registry
Sponsors
Rep. Gloria Fox [D] | Rep. Chris Walsh [D] | Sen. Linda Forry [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-25 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3869 |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H3869 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H367 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
H366 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H368 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H553 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
H367 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S1976
H366 (Similar To) 2015-09-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3754
H83 (Similar To) 2015-10-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H368 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H553 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1947 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1947.pdf |