MA H3240 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
Pending: Joint Veterans and Federal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the prohibition of nuclear weapons. Veterans and Federal Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolutions relative to the prohibition of nuclear weapons

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S1951 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
H2202 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/18/2019 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
S2165 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
S1516 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2545
H3211 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4404
H3923 (Similar To) 2019-08-27 - Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback