MA H3240 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-27 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-27 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the penalties for the use or manufacture of hidden compartments for the purpose of transporting or distributing controlled substances. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to hidden compartments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-04-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3240 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3240.pdf |