MA H3226 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Recommitted to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Recommitted to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to parking at certain airports for disabled veterans. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to parking at certain airports for disabled veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Recommitted to the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
2020-02-24 | House | Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance |
2019-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H2395 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2117 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2961 (Similar To) 2020-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4772
H2960 (Similar To) 2020-03-09 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2401 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
S2166 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1261 (Similar To) 2020-02-03 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3199 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2117 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2560
H3138 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3226 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3226.pdf |