MA H3204 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A SICK LEAVE BANK FOR DEBORAH HAWKINS, AN EMPLOYEE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF THE STATE AUDITOR
Title
AN ACT ESTABLISHING A SICK LEAVE BANK FOR DEBORAH HAWKINS, AN EMPLOYEE OF THE DEPARTMENT OF THE STATE AUDITOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 30 of the Acts of 2015 | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2015-06-01 | House | Enacted |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-06-01 | House | Emergency preamble adopted |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Senate concurred in the further House amendment |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-05-18 | House | House concurred in the Senate amendments with a further amendment |
2015-05-18 | House | Bills in the Third Reading report accepted |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read second, amended (as recommended by the committee on Ways and Means), ordered to a third reading, read third (title changed) and passed to be engrossed |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-03-26 | House | Passed to be engrossed |
2015-03-26 | House | Substituted for H3184 |
Same As/Similar To
H3093 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2416 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4367
H534 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4155
H3091 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Senate concurred
H956 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4198
H4754 (Similar To) 2017-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 356 of the Acts of 2016
H4760 (Similar To) 2016-12-15 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3204 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3204.pdf |