MA H314 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4880

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4880
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to real estate appraiser record retention requirements. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amending real estate appraiser record retention requirements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-30HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4880
2021-07-07JointLocation Changed - Hearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-07-07JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2021-07-06JointHearing scheduled for 07/12/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S2437 (Similar To) 2022-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1362 (Similar To) 2021-12-23 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 112 of the Acts of 2021
S881 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Hearing scheduled for 11/02/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2943 (Similar To) 2022-06-02 - Senate concurred
H3938 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S178 (Similar To) 2022-02-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S971 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Accompanied H1816
H4201 (Similar To) 2022-05-17 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
S1919 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/28/2022 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S868 (Similar To) 2022-06-21 - House concurred
H4880 (Replaced by) 2022-06-30 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback