MA H3138 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4083
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4083
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of benefits of veterans receiving public housing and other public assistance. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to veterans benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4083 |
2015-10-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/21/2015 from 02:00 PM-05:30 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H4083 (Replaced by) 2016-03-16 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H385 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H382 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4298
H146 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4120
H191 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H1321 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3138 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3138.pdf |