MA H3134 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Senate concurred
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to further regulate paid family leave. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish paid family leave

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateSenate concurred
2018-06-19HouseDischarged to the committee on House Ways and Means
2018-05-03SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-03HouseReporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-06HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 9, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-06-13JointHearing rescheduled to 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2017-05-31JointHearing scheduled for 06/13/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

S2029 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
H1430 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback