MA S2029 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2326
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to paid military leave. Veterans and Federal Affairs.
Title
Relative to paid military leave
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2326 |
2017-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S1054 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2017 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1932 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3777 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S1277 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
S2326 (Replaced by) 2018-05-08 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
S2017 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1932 (Similar To) 2018-06-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4591
H797 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H946 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H3777 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S1277 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2292
H1212 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2326
S2236 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - New draft substituted, see S2611
S2326 (Replaced by) 2018-05-08 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on Senate Ways and Means) adopted
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2029 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2029.pdf |