MA H3097 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Hearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
Pending: Joint Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the emission of soot, smoke or other particulates by diesel-powered vehicles. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the practice of coal rolling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2019 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S521 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
S1927 (Similar To) 2019-08-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2116 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - House concurred
S2005 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Hearing scheduled for 09/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in 437
H2869 (Similar To) 2019-07-17 - Hearing scheduled for 07/23/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H2991 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
H2995 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Senate concurred
S732 (Similar To) 2019-05-09 - Hearing rescheduled to 05/14/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
H853 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback