MA H3090 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to child-centered family law. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to child-centered family law
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-02 | Senate | Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-07-09 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2018-07-05 | House | Read third, amended and passed to be engrossed |
2018-06-07 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-04-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-05-01 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S1273 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - New draft substituted, see S2643
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2216 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1217 (Similar To) 2018-01-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4109
S701 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H187 (Similar To) 2017-07-26 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H109 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H981 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H881 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H926 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H934 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2070 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied H3740
H3944 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S2125 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H3740 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Reported by H4032
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2259 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3090 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3090.pdf |