MA H3084 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5246
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5246
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the corporate tax information initiative. Revenue.
Title
Relative to the corporate tax information initiative
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5246 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2969 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2853 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H5246 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1933 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1839 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H2853 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H5246 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1851 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1812 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
S1933 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1839 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3084 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3084.pdf |