MA H3079 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3045
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H3045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H3045
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the taxation of certain businesses legally selling marijuana. Revenue.
Title
Rescinding the discriminatory effect of IRC 280E on businesses legally selling marijuana
Sponsors
Rep. Chynah Tyler [D] | Rep. Nika Elugardo [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. David Robertson [D] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Accompanied H3045 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2981 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
S1928 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3097 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3008 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4009 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H2959 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1984 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H2959
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S2404 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1938 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H3045 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1928 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5248
S1913 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H3097 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H3008 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H4009 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
S2526 (Similar To) 2022-05-24 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 71 of the Acts of 2022
H2959 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1984 (Similar To) 2022-07-25 - Accompanied H2959
S1900 (Similar To) 2022-04-07 - Accompanied H2857
S2404 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1938 (Similar To) 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
H3045 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3079 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3079.pdf |