MA H4009 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Chapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Section 39 contained in the engrossed Bill making appropriations for the fiscal year 2022 for the maintenance of the departments, boards, commissions, institutions and certain activities of the Commonwealth, for interest, sinking fund and serial bond requirements and for certain permanent improvements (see House, No. 4002), which had been returned by His Excellency the Governor with recommendation of amendment (for message see Attachment I of House, No. 4019). July 22, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the taxation of pass-through entities

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-09-30 - Senate - Senate Question on passing , notwithstanding the objections of the Governor Roll Call #81 (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-29 - Senate - Senate Governor's Amendment Roll Call #73 (Y: 3 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30SenateChapter 69 of the Acts of 2021
2021-09-30SenatePassed over veto - see Roll Call #81 (Yeas 35 to Nays 3)
2021-09-23HousePassed over veto - 129 YEAS to 29 NAYS (See YEA and NAY No. 95 )
2021-08-05HousePlaced in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2021-08-05HouseFor message, see H4050
2021-08-03 Governor returned to the House with veto
2021-08-02SenateAgain enacted and again laid before the Governor
2021-08-02HouseRe-enacted
2021-08-02SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2021-08-02HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2021-07-29SenateGovernor's amendment rejected -see Roll Call #73 (Yeas 3 to Nays 36)
2021-07-29SenateRules suspended
2021-07-28HouseGovernor's amendment rejected
2021-07-28HouseGovernor's amendment considered (in the form approved by the committee on Bills in the Third Reading)
2021-07-28HouseBills in the Third Reading Special report accepted
2021-07-22HouseReferred to the committee on House Bills in the Third Reading
2021-07-22HouseFor message, see H4019, Attachment I
2021-07-22HouseGovernor returned to the House with recommendation of amendment
2021-07-22HouseEnacted as section 39 of the General Appropriation Bill, see H4002

Same As/Similar To

H4002 (Replaced by) 2021-07-29 - Section 121 passed over veto -see Roll Call #70 (Yeas 39 to Nays 1)
H4019 (Replaced by) 2021-07-22 - See H4002
H4050 (Replaced by) 2021-08-05 - See H4009
S2526 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback