MA H3061 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to application deadlines for agricultural, horticultural, or recreational land. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to application deadlines for agricultural, horticultural, or recreational land

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-07HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2022-01-18JointHearing rescheduled to 01/21/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-12-14JointHearing scheduled for 01/21/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29SenateSenate concurred
2021-03-29HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback