MA H3058 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-20 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Representative Hunt of Boston, a petition of Daniel J. Hunt and David Biele for the issuance of an annual proclamation by the Governor to designate the last full week in April as building trades recovery week. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Establishing building trades recovery week
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D] | Rep. David Biele [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2024-02-15 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2024-01-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2024-01-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2023-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
S1971 (Similar To) 2024-01-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2005 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2005 (Similar To) 2023-10-30 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3058 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H3058.pdf |