MA H3042 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4491
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to online mandated child abuse reporter training. The Judiciary.
Title
Relating to online mandated reporter training and neglect panel
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4491 |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-02-07 | House | Amendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence |
2018-02-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday July 2, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-12-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/05/17 from 12:00PM-5:00PM in B-1 |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-04-10 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H801 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H973 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H829 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H841 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4491 (Replaced by) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4852 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H973 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H829 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H841 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4491 (Replaced by) 2018-07-30 - Amendment (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) adopted
H4852 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3042 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H3042.pdf |