MA H3035 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to speed limits in historic districts. Transportation.
Title
Relative to speed limits in historic districts
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Madden [D] | Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. Jay Livingstone [D] | Rep. Sarah Peake [D] |
Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-03-24 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-03-24 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-03-10 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-09-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/06/2015 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H2782 (Similar To) 2016-09-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 267 of the Acts of 2016
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2152 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H223 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4183
H902 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H1473 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3035 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H3035.pdf |