MA H302 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain school threats. Education.
Title
Relative to school threats
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-06-08 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2017-05-18 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2017-04-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1154 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S327 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S315 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S327 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S1172 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S315 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2384
S296 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2428
H311 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1878 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H306 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2022 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H1082 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3733 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4396
H1319 (Similar To) 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
H1132 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2100 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2096 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - See H3654
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H302 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H302.pdf |