MA H3018 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5245
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5245
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to certain tax reporting requirements. Revenue.
Title
Relative to certain tax reporting requirements
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5245 |
2022-01-24 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/25/2022 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H1088 (Similar To) 2022-09-01 - Accompanied a study order, see H4976
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3919 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
H3965 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2022
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2673 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S2412 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3919 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 32 of the Acts of 2022
H3965 (Similar To) 2022-07-28 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 120 of the Acts of 2022
H4083 (Similar To) 2022-01-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 4 of the Acts of 2022
H5245 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H1376 (Similar To) 2022-04-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4686
S290 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
H2673 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3018 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H3018.pdf |