MA H3011 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate United States highway Route 20 as a state historic highway. Transportation.
Title
Designating United States highway Route 20 as a state historic highway
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-07 | House | Accompanied H3047 |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3130 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3047 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3004 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2080 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3047
H3047 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H3004 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
S2080 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3047
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3011 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3011.pdf |