MA H3004 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5126
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5126
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to designate certain portions of Route 9, Route 20 and Route 32 as the General Lafayette trail. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the Lafayette Trail
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Durant [R] | Sen. Anne Gobi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5126 |
2019-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/15/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H3011 (Similar To) 2019-11-07 - Accompanied H3047
H3130 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3130 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H5126 (Replaced by) 2020-11-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3004 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H3004.pdf |