MA H301 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4632
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to special education training. Education.
Title
Relative to special education training
Sponsors
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] | Rep. Josh Cutler [D] | Rep. Timothy Whelan [R] | Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] |
Rep. Fred Barrows [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4632 |
2017-09-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H332 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
H264 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H264 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H1168 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3719
S1371 (Similar To) 2018-01-26 - Accompanied S1328
S224 (Similar To) 2018-03-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2325
H1456 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2109 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2192
S2257 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2297 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4321 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4438
H4632 (Replaced by) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H301 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H301.pdf |