MA H3003 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4610

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the eligibility for in-state tuition rates and fees and for state-funded financial assistance at certain public institutions of higher education. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To provide access to higher education for high school graduates in the Commonwealth of Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4610
2017-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/15/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S239 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Accompanied H2056
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H41 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
H4610 (Replaced by) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback