MA H298 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4474

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4474
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to tenant agents. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for tenant agents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-28HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4474
2024-02-01JointHearing scheduled for 02/06/2024 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1
2023-06-09JointHearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2023-02-16SenateSenate concurred
2023-02-16HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H4234 (Similar To) 2024-06-06 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4474 (Replaced by) 2024-04-22 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4553 (Similar To) 2024-07-11 - Adopted, as amended
S2744 (Similar To) 2024-06-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4707 (Similar To) 2024-06-05 - Published as amended, see H4726

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback