MA H2979 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4438
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to exempting veterans from the standard registration fee for veterans license plates. Transportation.
Title
Exempting Veterans from the standard registration fee for Veterans license plates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4438 |
2015-11-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/03/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H4438 (Replaced by) 2016-06-29 - Reported, in part, by H3043
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H350 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4599
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601
H2490 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H1267 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H181 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2979 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2979.pdf |