MA H2977 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4778
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to homeowner’s insurance rates. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to home insurance rates
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4778 |
2017-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1774 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4651
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1644 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S887 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2971 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1573 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Accompanied S1604
S1644 (Similar To) 2017-07-20 - Accompanied S1503
S887 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H2984 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H498 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H2971 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H4778 (Replaced by) 2018-07-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2977 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2977.pdf |