MA H2984 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4528

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to reimbursement rates to disproportionate share hospitals . Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To restore adequate funding for disproportionate share hospitals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4528
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-05-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S656 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
S632 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1199 (Similar To) 2018-06-06 - Referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1270 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H2222 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H602 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H3728 (Similar To) 2018-07-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4778
H1136 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1207 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4257 (Similar To) 2018-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4692
H4528 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Reported, in part, by H1188

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback