MA H1207 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4682

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the sterilization of surgery rooms and intensive care units. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting sterilization during surgery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4682
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-12-07JointHearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1182 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2222 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S656 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1167 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Accompanied H1144
H1136 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1137 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H4682 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback