MA H2972 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5279
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5279
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to impose an excise tax on distributors of certain drinks with added sugar and promoting healthy alternatives to such drinks. Revenue.
Title
To promote healthy alternatives to sugary drinks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5279 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Sunday July 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-09 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 4, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S1914 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S179 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2666
S2312 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1807 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5279 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2972 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H2972.pdf |