MA H2969 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4546

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4546
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to authorize the Registrar of Motor Vehicles to suspend drivers' licenses due to certain unpaid fines for illegal construction work or other violations. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to unpaid fines for illegal construction work

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4546
2019-10-31JointHearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2019-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H4546 (Replaced by) 2020-03-09 - Reported, in part, by H3592

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback