MA H2940 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4728
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to providing tax credits for subscriptions to one or more local newspapers. Revenue.
Title
Relative to supporting local journalism
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Sen. Paul Mark [D] | Rep. Bud Williams [D] | Rep. James Hawkins [D] |
Rep. Tommy Vitolo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4728 |
2023-06-01 | Joint | Location Changed - Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2023 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H2903 (Similar To) 2024-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2886 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2925 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2946 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2957 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H4728 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2886 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2925 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H2946 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4727
H2957 (Similar To) 2024-06-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4728
H4728 (Replaced by) 2024-06-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2940 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H2940.pdf |