MA H2899 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4405
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure. Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy.
Title
Relative to conservation and natural gas infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4405 |
2019-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2019 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Telecommunications, Utilities and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
H731 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
H3146 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H2808 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1982 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1944 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S460 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S579 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2828 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
H3146 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2901 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4555
H2808 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
S1982 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S2007 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S1944 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2552
S460 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
S579 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
H2828 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4405
H3687 (Similar To) 2019-08-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H4405 (Replaced by) 2020-02-10 - Reported, in part, by H2881
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2899 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H2899.pdf |