MA S579 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2543
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts infrastructure bank. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts infrastructure bank
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2543 |
2019-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/30/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2019-01-22 | House | House concurred |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S92 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H868 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H130 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4490
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H437 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4426
H1220 (Similar To) 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
H868 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H130 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4490
S484 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2254
S2022 (Similar To) 2019-09-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S493 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2540
H2069 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5117
S2254 (Similar To) 2019-06-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2277 (Similar To) 2020-01-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S2404 (Similar To) 2019-11-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2422 (Similar To) 2019-12-02 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Rules
S2543 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S579 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/S579.pdf |